Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1644 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Springer (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1644
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to transferring charge and control of a painting entitled
 "The Spirit of the Alamo Lives On."
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Not later than December 1, 2017, the Texas
 Veterans Commission shall transfer charge and control of the
 painting entitled "The Spirit of the Alamo Lives On" by George
 Skypeck to the General Land Office.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *