E
|
05/26/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
E
|
05/22/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2478
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3993
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3781
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2097
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2097
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2097
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2097
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2097
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2097
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2096
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1605
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1605
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1363
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#494
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2017
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1991
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1991
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 558
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 558
|
House
|
02/08/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|