Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2109 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2109 | |
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3273 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1168 | Journal Page: 3272 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3272 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3272 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3226 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Record vote | RV#1139 | Journal Page: 3225 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3225 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3225 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1842 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 558 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 558 | |
House | 02/08/2017 | Filed |