House | 05/10/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1424 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 758 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 559 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 559 | |
House | 02/08/2017 | Filed |