Senate | 05/16/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1692 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2786 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#909 | Journal Page: 2785 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2785 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2785 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2696 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Record vote | RV#856 | Journal Page: 2695 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2695 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Amended | 1-Lucio | Journal Page: 2693 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2693 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/14/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 305 | |
House | 02/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 305 | |
House | 11/14/2016 | Filed |