Senate | 05/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1771 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3238 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1070 | Journal Page: 3102 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3102 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3102 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2982 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Amended | 1-Burrows | Journal Page: 2982 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2982 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 561 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 561 | |
House | 02/08/2017 | Filed |