Senate | 05/17/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1962 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1899 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1899 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1694 | |
House | 05/07/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2768 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#888 | Journal Page: 2768 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2768 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Amended | 1-Dean | Journal Page: 2767 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2767 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2676 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Amended | 1-Pickett | Journal Page: 2675 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2675 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2126 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 561 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 561 | |
House | 02/08/2017 | Filed |