Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1701 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Parker (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 1701
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the presentation of the investment policy of certain
 governmental entities to a business organization that conducts
 investment transactions for the entity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 2256.005(k) and (l), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (k)  A written copy of the investment policy shall be
 presented to any business organization [person] offering to engage
 in an investment transaction with an investing entity [or to an
 investment management firm under contract with an investing entity
 to invest or manage    the entity's investment portfolio]. For
 purposes of this subsection and Subsection (l), "business
 organization" means an [a business organization includes]
 investment pool or [pools and an] investment management firm under
 contract with an investing entity to invest or manage the entity's
 investment portfolio that has accepted authority granted by the
 entity under the contract to exercise investment discretion in
 regard to the investing entity's funds.  Nothing in this subsection
 relieves the investing entity of the responsibility for monitoring
 the investments made by the investing entity to determine that they
 are in compliance with the investment policy. The qualified
 representative of the business organization offering to engage in
 an investment transaction with an investing entity shall execute a
 written instrument in a form acceptable to the investing entity and
 the business organization substantially to the effect that the
 business organization has:
 (1)  received and reviewed the investment policy of the
 entity; and
 (2)  acknowledged that the business organization has
 implemented reasonable procedures and controls in an effort to
 preclude investment transactions conducted between the entity and
 the organization that are not authorized by the entity's investment
 policy, except to the extent that this authorization:
 (A)  is dependent on an analysis of the makeup of
 the entity's entire portfolio;
 (B)  [or] requires an interpretation of
 subjective investment standards; or
 (C)  relates to investment transactions of the
 entity that are not made through accounts or other contractual
 arrangements over which the business organization has accepted
 discretionary investment authority.
 (l)  The investment officer of an entity may not acquire or
 otherwise obtain any authorized investment described in the
 investment policy of the investing entity from a business
 organization that [person who] has not delivered to the entity the
 instrument required by Subsection (k).
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a contract for an investment transaction entered into with a
 business organization under Chapter 2256, Government Code, on or
 after the effective date of this Act. A contract entered into before
 the effective date of this Act is subject to the law in effect at the
 time the contract was entered into, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *