E | 05/29/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6064 | |
E | 05/24/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5095 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2605 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4358 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4575 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3997 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2235 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1915 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1661 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1661 | |
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1363 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2090 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Record vote | RV#531 | Journal Page: 2090 |
House | 04/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2090 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2090 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2034 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2034 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1509 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 787 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 787 | |
House | 02/09/2017 | Filed |