Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1771
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3238
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3119
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1086
|
Journal Page: 3118
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3118
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3118
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2997
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2997
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2997
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/8/17 5:49 PM
|
Journal Page: 2988
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2988
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 562
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 562
|
House
|
02/09/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|