E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3318
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5049
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5050
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1845
|
Journal Page: 5049
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5049
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4574
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 2699
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 2699
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Bettencourt
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2681
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2681
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1605
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1605
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1363
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2099
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#539
|
Journal Page: 2098
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2098
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2098
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2046
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
4-S. Thompson
|
Journal Page: 2046
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 2046
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
4-S. Thompson
|
Journal Page: 2045
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Amended
|
2-G. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 2042
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2040
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
House
|
02/09/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|