Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1743 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/10/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R8653 SRS-D
 By: Canales H.B. No. 1743


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study conducted by the Office of Court Administration
 of the Texas Judicial System on court reporting.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 72, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 72.032 to read as follows:
 Sec. 72.032.  STUDY OF COURT REPORTING. (a) In this
 section, "court reporting" means the practice of shorthand
 reporting for use in litigation in the courts of this state by
 making a verbatim record of an oral court proceeding, deposition,
 or proceeding before a grand jury, referee, or court commissioner
 using written symbols in shorthand, machine shorthand, or oral
 stenography.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2018, the office shall
 conduct a study of court reporting including:
 (1)  best practices for court reporting;
 (2)  the time required to complete a transcript
 request; and
 (3)  the backlog of pending transcript requests.
 (c)  Not later than January 1, 2019, the office shall issue a
 report on the study required under Subsection (b) and include
 recommendations on improving court reporting to the governor,
 lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.