House | 05/10/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3182 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Record vote | RV#1122 | Journal Page: 3181 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3181 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Amended | 1-Minjarez | Journal Page: 3181 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3181 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/06/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 565 | |
House | 03/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 565 | |
House | 02/10/2017 | Filed |