E
|
05/26/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
E
|
05/22/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4174
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3872
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1404
|
Journal Page: 3872
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3872
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3490
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hughes
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1531
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1233
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1804
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#348
|
Journal Page: 1752
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1752
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1752
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1738
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#317
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1430
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
House
|
02/10/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|