E
|
05/26/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
E
|
05/19/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4005
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2119
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3780
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3744
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2043
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2043
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2043
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2043
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1903
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1694
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#841
|
Journal Page: 2655
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2655
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Smithee, Phillips, Herrero, and Lucio
|
Journal Page: 2655
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2655
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2633
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#834
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
24-Turner
|
Journal Page: 2632
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
23-Y. Davis
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 2628
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Amended
|
17-Raymond
|
Journal Page: 2626
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 639
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 639
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|