Senate | 05/05/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1679 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2760 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#756 | Journal Page: 2544 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2544 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2544 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2394 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2394 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2394 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1843 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 651 | |
House | 03/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 651 | |
House | 03/02/2017 | Filed |