Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1780 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Dale (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1780
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 May 2, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 17, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requirements for membership in the reserve officer
 corps of the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 411.0208(a), Government Code, as added
 by Chapter 333 (H.B. 11), Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2015, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission may provide for the establishment of a
 reserve officer corps consisting of retired or previously
 commissioned peace officers, as defined by Article 2.12, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, [of the department] who retired or resigned in
 good standing.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *