House | 05/08/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3156 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 652 | |
House | 03/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 652 | |
House | 02/13/2017 | Filed |