E
|
05/26/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
E
|
05/18/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2053
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3663
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3665
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3488
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1620
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#649
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
House
|
03/14/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|