E
|
05/22/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
E
|
05/11/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3456
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3235
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3391
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3153
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Rodrguez
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1687
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 926
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 926
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 793
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 919
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#116
|
Journal Page: 918
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 899
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 899
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Amended
|
17-Krause
|
Journal Page: 896
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
16-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 895
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 893
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#113
|
Journal Page: 892
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
13-Turner
|
Journal Page: 891
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
6-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 887
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
9-G. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 887
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
|
7-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 885
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
6-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 883
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 870
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 750
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2017
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
House
|
02/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 499
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|