E
|
05/26/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
E
|
05/22/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4174
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4176
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3881
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3882
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1411
|
Journal Page: 3881
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3881
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3663
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2037
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2037
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2037
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2037
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2037
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2036
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2036
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Estes
|
Journal Page: 2036
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2036
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2036
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2071
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1915
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1695
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3026
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2803
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#929
|
Journal Page: 2802
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2802
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2802
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2707
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2707
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/5/17 2:15 PM
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1067
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 600
|
House
|
03/09/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 600
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|