Senate | 05/12/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3284 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#1177 | Journal Page: 3283 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3283 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Amended | 1-Gonzlez | Journal Page: 3281 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Point of order overruled | Rule 8, Section 1(c) | Journal Page: 3281 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3281 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Postponed | 5/11/17 11:55 AM | Journal Page: 3277 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 8, Section 1(c) | Journal Page: 3277 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Gonzlez | Journal Page: 3277 |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3277 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3231 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3231 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3231 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1842 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 732 | |
House | 03/20/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 732 | |
House | 02/14/2017 | Filed |