Senate | 04/18/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1013 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1509 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Record vote | RV#226 | Journal Page: 1456 |
House | 04/12/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1442 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Record vote | RV#218 | Journal Page: 1441 |
House | 04/11/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1441 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1441 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1111 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 609 | |
House | 03/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 609 | |
House | 02/14/2017 | Filed |