Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1877 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Murr (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1877
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a penalty for independent executors who misrepresent in
 an affidavit in lieu of the inventory, appraisement, and list of
 claims that certain beneficiaries received the inventory and
 appraisement.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 309, Estates Code, is
 amended by adding Section 309.0575 to read as follows:
 Sec. 309.0575.  PENALTY FOR MISREPRESENTATION IN AFFIDAVIT
 IN LIEU OF INVENTORY, APPRAISEMENT, AND LIST OF CLAIMS. (a)  The
 court, on its own motion or on motion of any person interested in
 the estate, and after an independent executor has been cited to
 answer at a time and place fixed in the notice, may fine an
 independent executor in an amount not to exceed $1,000 if the court
 finds that the executor misrepresented in an affidavit in lieu of
 the inventory, appraisement, and list of claims filed by the
 executor that all beneficiaries, other than those described by
 Section 309.056(b-1), received a verified, full, and detailed
 inventory and appraisement as required by Section 309.056(b).
 (b)  The independent executor and the executor's sureties,
 if any, are liable for any fine imposed under this section and for
 all damages and costs sustained by the executor's
 misrepresentation.  The fine, damages, and costs may be recovered
 in any court of competent jurisdiction.
 SECTION 2.  Section 309.0575, Estates Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to the estate of a decedent who dies on or after
 the effective date of this Act. The estate of a decedent who dies
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date of the decedent's death, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *