Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1884 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2017

                    By: Anderson of McLennan H.B. No. 1884
 (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the penalties for certain littering offenses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 42A.304(e), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (e)  A defendant required to perform community service under
 this article after conviction of an offense under Section 352.082,
 Local Government Code, or Section 365.012, 365.013, or 365.016,
 Health and Safety Code, shall perform the amount of service ordered
 by the court, which may not exceed 60 hours [of service]. The
 community service must consist of picking up litter in the county in
 which the defendant resides or working at a recycling facility if a
 program for performing that type of service is available in the
 community in which the court is located.
 SECTION 2.  Section 365.012, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (s) to read as follows:
 (s)  On conviction of an offense under this section, the
 court shall require the defendant, in addition to any fine or other
 penalty, to perform community service as provided by Article
 42A.304(e), Code of Criminal Procedure.
 SECTION 3.  Section 365.013, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  On conviction of an offense under this section, the
 court shall require the defendant, in addition to any fine or other
 penalty, to perform community service as provided by Article
 42A.304(e), Code of Criminal Procedure.
 SECTION 4.  Section 365.016, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  On conviction of an offense under this section, the
 court shall require the defendant, in addition to any fine or other
 penalty, to perform community service as provided by Article
 42A.304(e), Code of Criminal Procedure.
 SECTION 5.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *