LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB1884
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1884
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1884
Compare Versions
HB1884 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1884 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1884 Enrolled May 25, 2017
HB1884 Comm Sub May 19, 2017
HB1884 Engrossed May 6, 2017
HB1884 Comm Sub April 30, 2017
HB1884 Introduced February 14, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
HB1884 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1884 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1884 Enrolled May 25, 2017
HB1884 Comm Sub May 19, 2017
HB1884 Engrossed May 6, 2017
HB1884 Comm Sub April 30, 2017
HB1884 Introduced February 14, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare