E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/25/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5573
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2963
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4565
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4130
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1516
|
Journal Page: 4130
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4130
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3888
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2128
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2128
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2128
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2127
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2127
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2127
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2127
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2071
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1695
|
House
|
05/07/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3026
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2771
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#891
|
Journal Page: 2770
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2770
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2770
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2678
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Amended
|
2-Nevrez
|
Journal Page: 2677
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2677
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1802
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 625
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 625
|
House
|
02/14/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|