House | 05/04/2017 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2468 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 881 | Journal Page: 2468 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1448 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 625 | |
House | 03/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 625 | |
House | 02/14/2017 | Filed |