Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1912 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 85R22861 YDB-F
22 By: Cain, King of Parker, Wilson, Lambert, H.B. No. 1912
33 Blanco, et al.
44 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1912:
55 By: Gutierrez C.S.H.B. No. 1912
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to the Texas Medal for the Defense of Freedom award.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. Section 437.355(a), Government Code, as amended
1313 by Chapters 144 (H.B. 115) and 760 (H.B. 2108), Acts of the 84th
1414 Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is reenacted and amended to
1515 read as follows:
1616 (a) The governor or adjutant general, if delegated the
1717 authority, may adopt policies and regulations relating to awarding:
1818 (1) the Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be
1919 awarded to a service member who:
2020 (A) after September 11, 2001:
2121 (i) was inducted into federal service from
2222 the Texas National Guard; and
2323 (ii) meets the criteria for an award of the
2424 federal Purple Heart Medal; or
2525 (B) was wounded or killed at Fort Hood on
2626 November 5, 2009;
2727 (2) the Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be
2828 awarded to:
2929 (A) a service member of the Texas military forces
3030 who has:
3131 (i) completed 30 or more years of honorable
3232 state service or a combination of state and federal service; and
3333 (ii) continually demonstrated superior
3434 performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions
3535 demanding responsibility; or
3636 (B) a civilian who has contributed significant
3737 service to the Texas military forces;
3838 (3) the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal, which
3939 shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this state,
4040 another state, or the United States for exceptionally outstanding
4141 achievement or service to this state in performance of a duty of
4242 great responsibility while serving with the Texas military forces
4343 for whom the department receives a letter of recommendation for
4444 award of the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal that:
4545 (A) gives an account of the exceptional
4646 achievement or service; and
4747 (B) includes facts and photographs, and extracts
4848 from official documents to support and amplify the facts;
4949 (4) the Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which shall
5050 be awarded to a service member of the military forces of this state,
5151 another state, or the United States who has performed service in a
5252 superior and clearly outstanding manner;
5353 (5) the Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall
5454 be awarded to a service member who:
5555 (A) does not meet the criteria for an award of the
5656 federal Humanitarian Service Medal;
5757 (B) is a member of the Texas military forces; and
5858 (C) while serving on state active duty or active
5959 duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32, United
6060 States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a
6161 mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during
6262 or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state;
6363 (6) the Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which
6464 shall be awarded to a service member of the Texas military forces
6565 who served:
6666 (A) on or after September 11, 2001;
6767 (B) on state active duty or active duty under
6868 state authority in accordance with Title 32, United States Code;
6969 and
7070 (C) satisfactorily in defense support to a
7171 mission in the state under civilian authority;
7272 (7) the Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded
7373 to a service member who was inducted into federal service from the
7474 Texas military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or
7575 after June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days;
7676 (8) the Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be
7777 awarded to a service member of the Texas National Guard who served,
7878 after September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by
7979 the United States secretary of defense;
8080 (9) the Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be
8181 awarded to a member of the Texas military forces who has completed
8282 five years of honorable service during which the service member has
8383 shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to
8484 this state;
8585 (10) the Texas Medal of Merit, which shall be awarded
8686 to a member of the military forces of this state, another state, or
8787 the United States who performs outstanding service or attains
8888 extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States;
8989 (11) the Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall
9090 be awarded to a service member who completes three consecutive
9191 years of honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the
9292 service member has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and
9393 great loyalty to this state;
9494 (12) the Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign
9595 Medal, which shall be awarded to a service member who was inducted
9696 into federal service from the Texas National Guard after August 1,
9797 1990, in support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert
9898 Storm, without regard to the place that the service member was
9999 deployed while serving on active federal military duty;
100100 (13) the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which shall be
101101 awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
102102 from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place that the
103103 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
104104 military duty, after:
105105 (A) March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi
106106 Freedom; or
107107 (B) August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New
108108 Dawn;
109109 (14) the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which shall
110110 be awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
111111 from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of
112112 Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the
113113 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
114114 military duty; [and]
115115 (15) the Cold War Medal, which, subject to Subsection
116116 (c), shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this
117117 state or the United States who:
118118 (A) served between September 2, 1945, and
119119 December 26, 1991; and
120120 (B) was a resident of this state at the time the
121121 service member entered military service; and
122122 (16) the Texas Medal for the Defense of Freedom, which
123123 shall be awarded to any civilian who is killed or wounded by hostile
124124 action while serving under any competent authority of the
125125 department under conditions for which a service member would be
126126 eligible for receipt of the Texas Purple Heart Medal.
127127 SECTION 2. To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
128128 over another Act of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017,
129129 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
130130 codes.
131131 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.