E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6061
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3535
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5346
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1917
|
Journal Page: 5346
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5346
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4821
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1900
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1900
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#589
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Amended
|
1-K. King and Price
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2017
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1068
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 627
|
House
|
03/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 627
|
House
|
02/24/2017
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|