House | 05/12/2017 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 3397 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 3397 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3391 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 1540 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1540 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 788 | |
House | 03/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 788 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Filed |