Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1983 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Wray, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 1983
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of a first responder for workers'
 compensation benefits for post-traumatic stress disorder.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 504, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 504.019 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.019.  COVERAGE FOR POST-TRAUMATIC STRESS DISORDER
 FOR CERTAIN FIRST RESPONDERS. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "First responder" means an individual employed by
 a political subdivision of this state who is:
 (A)  a peace officer under Article 2.12, Code of
 Criminal Procedure;
 (B)  a person licensed under Chapter 773, Health
 and Safety Code, as an emergency care attendant, emergency medical
 technician, emergency medical technician-intermediate, emergency
 medical technician-paramedic, or licensed paramedic; or
 (C)  a firefighter subject to certification by the
 Texas Commission on Fire Protection under Chapter 419, Government
 Code, whose principal duties are firefighting and aircraft crash
 and rescue.
 (2)  "Post-traumatic stress disorder" means a disorder
 that meets the diagnostic criteria for post-traumatic stress
 disorder specified by the American Psychiatric Association in the
 Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders, fifth
 edition, or a later edition adopted by the commissioner of workers'
 compensation.
 (b)  Post-traumatic stress disorder suffered by a first
 responder is a compensable injury under this subtitle only if it is
 based on a diagnosis that:
 (1)  the disorder is caused by an event occurring in the
 course and scope of the first responder's employment; and
 (2)  the preponderance of the evidence indicates that
 the event was a substantial contributing factor of the disorder.
 SECTION 2.  Section 408.006(b), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 504.019, a [A] mental or
 emotional injury that arises principally from a legitimate
 personnel action, including a transfer, promotion, demotion, or
 termination, is not a compensable injury under this subtitle.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a claim for workers' compensation benefits based on a
 compensable injury that occurs on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A claim based on a compensable injury that occurs before
 that date is governed by the law as it existed on the date the
 compensable injury occurred, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *