Senate | 05/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2090 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1695 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2801 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#927 | Journal Page: 2801 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2801 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2801 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2704 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Amended | 1-Israel | Journal Page: 2704 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2704 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2190 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 695 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 695 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Filed |