E
|
06/12/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
06/02/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Comptroller
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const.
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3596
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5551
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5553
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5551
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
Journal Page: 5551
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1934
|
Journal Page: 5551
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5551
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4566
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2580
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2580
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2580
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2580
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2580
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2580
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2580
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2224
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 936
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1431
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1418
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
Journal Page: 1418
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#212
|
Journal Page: 1418
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1418
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1418
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1417
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#159
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Isaac and Romero
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#127
|
Journal Page: 953
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Motion to suspend rules fails
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
|
|
Journal Page: 952
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 951
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 552
|
House
|
03/06/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 552
|
House
|
03/03/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|