Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1796 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1796 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1619 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2646 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2319 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Record vote | RV#634 | Journal Page: 2319 |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2319 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2319 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2234 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Amended | 3-Roberts | Journal Page: 2234 |
House | 05/02/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2232 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair | ||
House | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 274 | |
House | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 274 | |
House | 02/10/2017 | Filed |