Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2029 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lozano, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2029
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2017;
 April 26, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 16, 2017, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 16, 2017, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption of certain commercial weighing or
 measuring devices from registration and inspection requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 13, Agriculture Code, is
 amended by adding Section 13.1002 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.1002.  EXEMPTION OF CERTAIN WEIGHING OR MEASURING
 DEVICES. Notwithstanding any other law, a commercial weighing or
 measuring device that is exclusively used to weigh food sold for
 immediate consumption is exempt from this subchapter, including the
 inspection requirements under Section 13.101 and the registration
 requirements under Section 13.1011.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *