House | 05/10/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3201 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Record vote | RV#1129 | Journal Page: 3200 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3200 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Amended | 1-Moody | Journal Page: 3200 |
House | 05/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3200 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 631 | |
House | 03/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 631 | |
House | 02/17/2017 | Filed |