Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3026
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2802
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#928
|
Journal Page: 2802
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2802
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2802
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2706
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#860
|
Journal Page: 2706
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2706
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Moody
|
Journal Page: 2704
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 2704
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2704
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2190
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
House
|
02/17/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|