Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2072 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            85R24277 JCG-D
 By: Gutierrez H.B. No. 2072
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2072:
 By:  Kuempel C.S.H.B. No. 2072


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility and requirements for the issuance and
 renewal of a license in massage therapy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 455.1525, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 455.1525.  CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD INFORMATION
 REQUIREMENT FOR LICENSE ISSUANCE [BACKGROUND CHECKS]. (a) The
 department shall require that an applicant for a license submit a
 complete and legible set of fingerprints, on a form prescribed by
 the department, to the department or to the Department of Public
 Safety for the purpose of obtaining criminal history record
 information from the Department of Public Safety and the Federal
 Bureau of Investigation  [On receipt of an application for a license
 under this chapter, the department shall conduct a criminal
 background check on the applicant].
 (b)  The department may not issue a license to a person who
 does not comply with the requirement of Subsection (a).
 (c)  The department shall conduct a criminal history record
 information check of each applicant for a license using
 information:
 (1)  provided by the individual under this section; and
 (2)  made available to the department by the Department
 of Public Safety, the Federal Bureau of Investigation, and any
 other criminal justice agency under Chapter 411, Government Code.
 (d)  The department may:
 (1)  enter into an agreement with the Department of
 Public Safety to administer a criminal history record information
 check required under this section; and
 (2)  authorize the Department of Public Safety to
 collect from each applicant the costs incurred by the Department of
 Public Safety in conducting the criminal history record information
 check [An applicant is not eligible for a license under this chapter
 if the applicant, in the five years preceding the date of the
 application, has been finally convicted of a misdemeanor involving
 moral turpitude or a felony].
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 455, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 455.1605 to read as follows:
 Sec. 455.1605.  CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD INFORMATION
 REQUIREMENT FOR LICENSE RENEWAL. (a) An applicant renewing a
 license issued under this chapter shall submit a complete and
 legible set of fingerprints for purposes of performing a criminal
 history record information check of the applicant as provided by
 Section 455.1525.
 (b)  The department may not renew the license of a person who
 does not comply with the requirement of Subsection (a).
 (c)  A license holder is not required to submit fingerprints
 under this section for the renewal of the license if the license
 holder has previously submitted fingerprints under:
 (1)  Section 455.1525 for the initial issuance of the
 license; or
 (2)  this section as part of a prior license renewal.
 (d)  This section expires August 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than April 1, 2018, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules as
 necessary to implement Section 455.1525, Occupations Code, as
 amended by this Act, and Section 455.1605, Occupations Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Section 455.1525, Occupations Code, as amended
 by this Act, and Section 455.1605, Occupations Code, as added by
 this Act, apply only to an application for the issuance or renewal
 of a license submitted on or after August 1, 2018.  An application
 submitted before that date is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the application was submitted, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.