Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2079 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hunter, Howard (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 2079
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2017, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the promotion of tourism related to the musical
 heritage of this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 442, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 442.019 to read as follows:
 Sec. 442.019.  TEXAS MUSIC HISTORY TRAIL.  (a)  The
 commission shall develop a Texas Music History Trail program to
 promote and preserve Texas music history.
 (b)  The program, at a minimum, shall include:
 (1)  designation of locations or organizations that are
 historically significant to this state's musical heritage;
 (2)  adoption of an icon, symbol, or other identifying
 device to represent a designation under this section;
 (3)  the use of the icon, symbol, or other identifying
 device in promoting tourism around this state and at the locations
 or organizations designated under this section; and
 (4)  to the extent funds are available, the development
 of itineraries and maps to guide tourists to locations or
 organizations designated under this section.
 (c)  The commission shall adopt:
 (1)  eligibility criteria for a designation under this
 section; and
 (2)  procedures to administer the program created under
 this section.
 (d)  To implement this section, the commission may, as
 necessary, enter into a memorandum of understanding with:
 (1)  the Texas Economic Development and Tourism Office,
 including the divisions of the governor's office responsible for
 tourism and music, film, television, and multimedia;
 (2)  the Texas Commission on the Arts; or
 (3)  the Texas Department of Transportation.
 (e)  The commission may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and
 other donations from any source to implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *