Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3290
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3290
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3290
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4879
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4879
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4879
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4364
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Watson
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1952
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1566
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1566
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1196
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1586
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#285
|
Journal Page: 1586
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1586
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1586
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1424
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 720
|
House
|
03/16/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 720
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|