E
|
05/26/2017
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
September 1, 2019
|
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5684
|
E
|
05/18/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3742
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3746
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3488
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
Senate
|
05/12/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1605
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1605
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1343
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2126
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1960
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#471
|
Journal Page: 1959
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1959
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1959
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Goldman
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1831
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1451
|
House
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
House
|
03/20/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 733
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|