Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2121 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Cyrier, Anderson of McLennan H.B. No. 2121
 (Senate Sponsor - Hughes)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2017;
 May 16, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 1; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to damages in certain contract claims against the state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2260.003, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c), an award of damages
 under this chapter may include attorney's fees if:
 (1)  the claim is for breach of a written contract for:
 (A)  engineering, architectural, or construction
 services; or
 (B)  materials related to the services described
 by Paragraph (A); and
 (2)  the amount in controversy is less than $250,000,
 excluding penalties, costs, expenses, prejudgment interest, and
 attorney's fees.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2260.003, Government Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to an action filed on or after the effective
 date of this Act. An action filed before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law applicable to the action immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *