Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2110 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1771 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3238 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3096 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1066 | Journal Page: 3096 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3096 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3095 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2967 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2967 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Postponed | 5/8/17 4:00 PM | Journal Page: 2960 |
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2959 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2299 | |
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 634 | |
House | 03/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 634 | |
House | 02/20/2017 | Filed |