E | 05/29/2017 | Effective on 1/1/18 | ||
E | 05/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6064 | |
E | 05/19/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4005 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2119 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3780 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3890 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3745 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2088 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2088 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2088 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2088 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2088 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2088 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2088 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1903 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1605 | |
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1605 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1234 | |
House | 04/21/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1804 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Record vote | RV#350 | Journal Page: 1753 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1753 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1753 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1739 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1739 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1681 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | RV#317 | Journal Page: 1681 |
House | 04/19/2017 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1681 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1448 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 634 | |
House | 03/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 634 | |
House | 02/20/2017 | Filed |