Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2130 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Roberts, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 2130
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
3- May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Education; May 16, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 16, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 2130
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to a study conducted by the Texas Education Agency
126 regarding the statewide assessment program in relation to students
137 in special education programs.
148 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
159 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 39, Education Code, is
1610 amended by adding Section 39.02302 to read as follows:
1711 Sec. 39.02302. STUDY OF STATEWIDE ASSESSMENT PROGRAM IN
1812 RELATION TO STUDENTS IN SPECIAL EDUCATION PROGRAMS. (a) Using data
1913 collected by the agency, including data collected during the
2014 2015-2016 and 2017-2018 school years, the agency, from funds
2115 already appropriated, shall conduct a study of the impact of the
2216 statewide assessment program on students in a special education
2317 program under Subchapter A, Chapter 29.
2418 (b) In conducting the study, the agency shall address:
2519 (1) whether the agency has determined that the
2620 administration of alternate assessment instruments to students in a
2721 special education program under Subchapter A, Chapter 29, as
2822 provided by Section 39.023(b) complies with the Every Student
2923 Succeeds Act (20 U.S.C. Section 6301 et seq.);
3024 (2) whether administering state-required assessment
3125 instruments, other than assessment instruments developed or
3226 adopted under Section 39.023(b), to students in a special education
3327 program under Subchapter A, Chapter 29, will:
3428 (A) provide an accurate assessment of the
3529 academic achievement of the students;
3630 (B) result in the administration of assessment
3731 instruments that are inappropriate for the educational capacity of
3832 the students;
3933 (C) result in a decrease in the number of
4034 students promoted to the next grade level;
4135 (D) result in a decrease in graduation rates for
4236 the students;
4337 (E) result in fewer opportunities to pursue
4438 higher education options;
4539 (F) result in fewer opportunities for
4640 competitive integrated employment for the students; and
4741 (G) result in any other:
4842 (i) restrictions on the students;
4943 (ii) alternative placements for the
5044 students; or
5145 (iii) limitations on the advancement of the
5246 students; and
5347 (3) whether making a statutory change that has the
5448 effect of exempting students in a special education program under
5549 Subchapter A, Chapter 29, from the administration of an assessment
5650 instrument under Section 39.023 unless the student's parent or
5751 guardian requests such administration would impact the statewide
5852 assessment program and the extent of any such impact, including any
5953 legal impact.
6054 (c) In conducting the study, the agency shall identify
6155 specific recommendations to improve the impact of the statewide
6256 assessment program on students in a special education program under
6357 Subchapter A, Chapter 29, including recommendations for:
6458 (1) any reforms or changes with respect to contracting
6559 with assessment instrument vendors;
6660 (2) any reforms or changes with respect to improving
6761 student grade-level promotion rates and student graduation rates;
6862 (3) any reforms or changes with respect to developing
6963 allowable accommodations and applying principles of universal
7064 design for students during the administration of assessment
7165 instruments;
7266 (4) any changes to rules adopted by the State Board of
7367 Education or the commissioner relating to the development,
7468 adoption, or administration of assessment instruments;
7569 (5) any statutory changes to this code relating to the
7670 development, adoption, or administration of assessment
7771 instruments; and
7872 (6) any additional reforms or changes based on the
7973 results of the study.
8074 (d) Not later than October 1, 2018, the agency shall submit
8175 a report to each member of the legislature containing the agency's
8276 determinations and recommendations under this section.
8377 (e) The agency shall publish on the agency's Internet
8478 website the report submitted under Subsection (d), all data on
8579 which the agency relied to form the basis of the agency's
8680 determinations and recommendations, and the methodologies the
8781 agency used to conduct the study.
8882 (f) This section expires January 1, 2019.
8983 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
9084 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
9185 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
9286 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
9387 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
94- * * * * *
88+ ______________________________ ______________________________
89+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
90+ I certify that H.B. No. 2130 was passed by the House on May 4,
91+ 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 10, 2 present, not
92+ voting.
93+ ______________________________
94+ Chief Clerk of the House
95+ I certify that H.B. No. 2130 was passed by the Senate on May
96+ 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
97+ ______________________________
98+ Secretary of the Senate
99+ APPROVED: _____________________
100+ Date
101+ _____________________
102+ Governor