Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB214 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Canales (Senate Sponsor - Burton) H.B. No. 214
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 214 By:  Birdwell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a recording of certain proceedings of the Texas Supreme
 Court and Court of Criminal Appeals and the publication of the
 recordings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 22, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 22.303 to read as follows:
 Sec. 22.303.  RECORDING OF CERTAIN COURT PROCEEDINGS. If
 appropriated funds or donations are available in the amount
 necessary to cover the cost, the supreme court and the court of
 criminal appeals shall make a video recording or other electronic
 visual and audio recording of each oral argument and public meeting
 of the court and post the recording on the court's Internet website.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Supreme Court and the Court of Criminal
 Appeals are required to implement this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the Texas Supreme Court and the Court of Criminal Appeals
 may, but are not required to, implement this Act using other
 appropriations available for the purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *