LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
House
Bills
HB214
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB214
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas House Bill HB214
Compare Versions
HB214 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB214 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB214 Enrolled May 27, 2017
HB214 Comm Sub May 21, 2017
HB214 Engrossed May 4, 2017
HB214 Comm Sub April 25, 2017
HB214 Introduced November 14, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
HB214 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB214 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB214 Enrolled May 27, 2017
HB214 Comm Sub May 21, 2017
HB214 Engrossed May 4, 2017
HB214 Comm Sub April 25, 2017
HB214 Introduced November 14, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare