House
|
05/12/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3397
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3397
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 759
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 759
|
House
|
02/21/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|