Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB22 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2017
Bill April 24, 2017